Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17911 Week
» 70927 Month
» 190454 Year
» 3217307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2426 |
|
02/1892 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Dean Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
87 |
Works Number |
1296 |
To Service |
During 02/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/12/1953 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
WES |
Westbury |
4w/e |
18/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
82D |
Westbury |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1903 |
S4 boiler fitted |
09/1905 |
S2 boiler fitted |
05/1908 |
S4 boiler fitted |
09/1911 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2426 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1296 |
|
|
04/1903 |
Modification |
Modification: S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1905 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (WES) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
14/12/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2426 |
|
|