Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2550 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15956 Week
» 68972 Month
» 188499 Year
» 3215352 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2482 |
|
05/1896 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Dean Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
100 |
Works Number |
1484 |
To Service |
During 05/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/12/1952 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
89B |
Brecon |
4w/e |
17/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1901 |
S2 boiler fitted |
09/1903 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2482 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1484 |
|
|
04/1901 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1903 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (WES) |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (GWR) (wes) |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (WES) |
|
|
22/07/1939 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
17/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brecon (89B) |
|
|
22/12/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2482 |
|
|