|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering works during October and November included 1366, 1409, 1416, 1538, 2017, 2092, 2212, 2411, 2538, 2612, 2708, 2792,2817, 2825, 2836, 2842, 2851, 2859, 2882, 2883, 2884, 2885, 2906, 2927, 2947, 2955,2980, 2987, 2889, 3016, 3026, 3363, 3421, 4038, 4042. 4046, 4052, 4059, 4903, 4934,4953, 4954, 4966, 4973, 5949, 5961, 5989, 5997, 6917, 6922, 6929, 6947, 6959, 70876, 77086, 77326, and 79309 | SLS/194701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1897 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2538 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1579 |
||
10/1905 | Modification | Modification: S2 boiler fitted | ||
07/1910 | Modification | Modification: B4 boiler fitted | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
23/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (CNYD) | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | |||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brecon (89B) | ||
24/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hereford (85C) | ||
08/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) | ||
15/05/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2538 | ||
15/06/1957 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |