Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 76 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17879 Week
» 70895 Month
» 190422 Year
» 3217275 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2637 |
m/e |
06/1901 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Aberdare |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
131 |
Works Number |
1924 |
To Service |
During 06/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/09/1947 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1911 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
12/1916 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2637 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1924 |
|
|
10/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
15/09/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2637 |
|
|
01/11/1947 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|