|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). | SLS/194710 |
21/10/1948 | Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) | On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2845 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2445 |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Southall (SHL) | ||
11/08/1947 | Modification | Modification: Converted to oil burnng | ||
11/08/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4809 | ||
15/12/1949 | Modification | Modification: Oil burning equipment removed | ||
15/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2845 | ||
31/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD) | ||
12/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
31/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southall (81C) | ||
21/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
13/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
11/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) | ||
14/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (84C) | ||
24/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2845 | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |