Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 568 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18371 Week
» 71387 Month
» 190914 Year
» 3217767 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
49 |
m/e |
10/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
290 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5385 |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 26/07/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys |
Total Mileage |
829,727 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 49 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5385 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 290 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ferndale (CV.FDL) |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ferndale (CV.FDL) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
26/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 290 |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|