Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3996 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17402 Week
» 70418 Month
» 189945 Year
» 3216798 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
59 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
293 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Manning, Wardle & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1700 |
To Service |
During 06/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 27/07/1951 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
Total Mileage |
689,952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1907 |
CVRYR |
|
|
8w/e |
23/03/1946 |
RYR |
|
Radyr |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
RHY |
|
Rhymney |
m/e |
31/03/1948 |
RYR |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
10/07/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/07/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RYR |
Radyr |
4w/e |
23/02/1946 |
ALLOC |
RHY |
Rhymney |
m/e |
31/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
RYR |
Radyr |
4w/e |
10/07/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 59 Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 1700 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 293 |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 293 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|