Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14445 Week
» 67461 Month
» 186988 Year
» 3213841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
97 |
m/e |
07/1908 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
298 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5097 |
To Service |
During 07/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 10/07/1948 |
Service Life |
40 yrs , 10 dys |
Total Mileage |
649,852 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1908 |
CV.FDL |
|
Ferndale |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/07/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
FDL |
Ferndale |
m/e |
31/07/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 97 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5097 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 298 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ferndale (CV.FDL) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 298 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|