Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 24 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 842 Week
» 17793 Month
» 170746 Year
» 1836122 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
South Eastern Railway 109 m/e 05/1896
Southern Railway (1923) A109 y/e 1923
Southern Railway (1931) 1109 y/e 1931
British Railways 31109 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Stirling / H. Wainwright
Class O1
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O05/1896
O1 (0-6-0)10/1927
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1896
Withdrawal During 01/1949
Service Life 52 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1896
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 4w/e 01/04/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 01/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 4w/e 01/04/1948
WDN TON Tonbridge on 08/01/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1896 To Service To service as South Eastern Railway Number 109
Built at Ashford Works
   
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to A109    
1931 Renumbered Renumbered to 1109    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 31109 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
1949 Scrapped Scrapped    
01/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1109    

prev prev