Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 50 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17853 Week
» 70869 Month
» 190396 Year
» 3217249 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3112 |
m/e |
01/1905 |
Great Western Railway (51xx) |
5112 |
on |
02/06/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3100/5100 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
150 |
Works Number |
2067 |
To Service |
During 01/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 06/10/1955 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,030,140 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1911 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3112 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2067 |
|
|
12/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
02/06/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5112 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kidderminster (KDR) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) |
|
|
06/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5112 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|