|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/12/1963 | Swindon Works (Dump) | Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. | SLS/196401 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 3145 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2152 |
||
12/1911 | Modification | Modification: Superheated boiler fitted | ||
03/1928 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5145 | ||
01/11/1938 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8103 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (87H) | ||
28/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
14/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
28/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llantrisant (88G) | ||
02/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Radyr (88B) | ||
28/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 8103 |