Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 5203 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20815 Week
» 119460 Month
» 322124 Year
» 3348977 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3156 |
m/e |
04/1907 |
Great Western Railway (31xx) |
3101 |
m/e |
02/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
31xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
169 |
Works Number |
2244 |
To Service |
During 04/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/09/1957 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
Total Mileage |
385,558 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3156 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2244 |
|
|
02/1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3101 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
23/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3101 |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|