Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15078 Week
» 68094 Month
» 187621 Year
» 3214474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
118 |
m/e |
10/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
321 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Great Western Railway (1946) |
215 |
on |
14/04/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5391 |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 23/07/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
Total Mileage |
739,825 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1910 |
CV.FDL |
|
Ferndale |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/07/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Caerphilly Works |
On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 118 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5391 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 321 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ferndale (CV.FDL) |
|
|
14/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 215 |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 215 |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|