|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 17/09/1952 | 11/10/1952 | 25 days | Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 19/01/1954 | 04/02/1954 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 05/05/1954 | 29/05/1954 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 05/01/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 38 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 31/08/1957 | 28/09/1957 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 13/01/1959 | 07/02/1959 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 06/08/1959 | 15/08/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 02/12/1960 | 27/01/1961 | 57 days | General | Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
Eastleigh Works | 20/08/1962 | 25/08/1962 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 26/02/1963 | 06/04/1963 | 40 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 10/08/1964 | 02/09/1964 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 16/11/1964 | 14/12/1964 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Brighton Works | A reconditioned boiler (BE.926) has arrived at Brighton for 'H.1' class locomotive No. 32037 Selsey Bill, now undergoing heavy repair. No. 34065 Hurricane ('B.O.B.' Class) which was about to leave the works in the experimental light green livery, has been repainted in the old S.R. livery with yellow bands. Re-numbered at Brighton: Nos. 32023/30 (6/4); No. 34008 Padstow (8/4); Nos. 32113 an 90527 (ex 77056) (11/4); 32525 an 34009 Lyme Regis (13/4). No. 32151, ex Eastleigh Works, was noted lined out at Brighton shed on 10/4 and on 20/4 No. 31826 was observed here in the same style. | SLS/194905 |
31/01/1951 | Eastleigh Works | ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. | SLS/195103 |
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Kingmoor MPD | In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. | SLS/196304 |
11/04/1963 | Derby Works | Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. | SLS/196304 |
27/04/1963 | Birmingham Excursions | On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. | SLS/196304 |
16/10/1967 | United Waggon Co., Newport (Mon.) | Dumped locomotives: 34005, 34008, 34009, 34017, 34026, 34032, 34047, 34057, 34088, 34098, 34104, 34108, 48249, 48509, 73002, 73016, 76039, 76058, 76063, 76088, 78063, 82003, 82031, 82034. | SLS/196712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/09/1945 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C109 Built at Brighton Works |
||
21/09/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3271 | ||
27/08/1946 | Naming | Named 'LYME REGIS' by H I Blanchard (Mayor) at Axminster | ||
30/09/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3265 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
13/04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34009 | ||
11/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
13/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
17/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952. | ||
19/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 04/02/1954. | ||
05/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/05/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954. | ||
05/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. | ||
31/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 31/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957. | ||
13/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959. | ||
06/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959. | ||
02/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1960. Dep: 27/01/1961. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
20/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1962. Dep: 25/08/1962. | ||
26/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/02/1963. Dep: 06/04/1963. | ||
10/08/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1964. Dep: 02/09/1964. | ||
14/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
16/11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1964. Dep: 14/12/1964. | ||
27/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34009 | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |