|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 27/05/1953 | 27/06/1953 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 04/03/1954 | 18/03/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 14/04/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 18 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 07/02/1955 | 12/03/1955 | 34 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 28/08/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 24/01/1958 | 21/02/1958 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 09/07/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 16/12/1960 | 11/02/1961 | 58 days | General | Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
Eastleigh Works | 09/02/1962 | 24/02/1962 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Stewarts Lane (on shed) | 13/12/1962 | 14/12/1962 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 25/04/1963 | 25/05/1963 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 01/12/1965 | 14/01/1966 | 45 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/02/1962 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. | SLS/196204 |
25/02/1962 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. | SLS/196204 |
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
12/08/1967 | Salisbury MPD | On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1946 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C124, name: TAMAR VALLEY Built at Brighton Works |
||
11/02/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3274 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
01/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34024 | ||
12/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) | ||
26/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
01/11/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3281 | ||
03/03/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3274 | ||
27/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/05/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953. | ||
04/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 18/03/1954. | ||
14/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. | ||
07/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955. | ||
28/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. | ||
24/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/01/1958. Dep: 21/02/1958. | ||
09/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/07/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959. | ||
16/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1960. Dep: 11/02/1961. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
09/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1962. Dep: 24/02/1962. | ||
13/12/1962 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Stewarts Lane (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1962. Dep: 14/12/1962. | ||
25/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/04/1963. Dep: 25/05/1963. | ||
03/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) | ||
01/12/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/12/1965. Dep: 14/01/1966. | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34024 | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |