06/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C131, name: TORRINGTON Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
03/06/1946 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3282 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34031 |
|
|
12/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
18/02/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/02/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953. |
|
|
17/08/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954. |
|
|
31/01/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956. |
|
|
14/05/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957. |
|
|
10/10/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1958. Dep: 29/11/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 3354 (LP Series 2) attached. Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...
|
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
18/05/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/05/1960. Dep: 11/06/1960. |
|
|
18/12/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/12/1962. Dep: 26/01/1963. |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
07/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34031 |
|
|
20/04/1965 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3338 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|