Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3445 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13019 Week
» 77973 Month
» 280637 Year
» 3307490 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C138 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
34038 |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
09/1946 |
LYNTON |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 1 |
3256 |
05/09/1946 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3303 |
31/12/1948 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3253 |
03/12/1955 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3252 |
28/08/1965 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BTN |
Brighton |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
q/e |
14/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
P |
24/11/1960 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
09/11/1961 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
18/01/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/06/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
New construction: 4-6-2 34110; 2-6-4T 42097-42166, the first three being in a forward stage. 42096 came out early in July and bears a Brighton date plate, 1950. In for repair: 0-6-OT 515S; 0-6-2T 32460, 32594; 4-4-2T 32083; 2-6-0 32347; 2-8-0 77030, 77108, 77359; 4-6-2 34036, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34038 Lynton, 34082 615 Squadron. 34036 will probably now receive its name-plates Westward Ho!: this was the engine which was fitted to burn oil on the Laidlaw-Drew method till September 1948, when it was re-converted at Eastleigh to burn coal: for some reason the plates were not then affixed. The 'D.3' 32378 compares unfavourably in appearance with others of the class, as it is painted unlined black without even the usual emblem: on the other hand 32386 is kept in good condition, and the lining and emblem make it look attractive. The class 'G.6' tank recently repaired at Brighton has not been renumbered 30272 as anticipated, but is now DS3152 with tanks lettered -Engineer's Dept.' Meldon Quarry.' There is no mention of British Railways on the tanks. B.O.B. 34074 is now named 46 Squadron. Engines going through Brighton shops hitherto have been very thoroughly brought into line with latest ideas as to lettering, etc., but 'R.1' bogie tank 31706 has had SOUTHERN replaced by the B.R. totem, yet still retaining the green shaded numerals on the bunker. The side tanks only have been repainted. |
SLS/195008 |
31/12/1950 |
Miscellaneous |
No. 32005 'I1x', ex store at Eastbourne, was also at Hastings, Brighton and Tunbridge Wells on special local and parcel trains during the holiday period. No. 2002, of the same class, has done a lot of work since early December. Among other engines ex store were 'Hl' Nos. 32037/8, and 'B4x' Nos. 2045/67. Class 4MTTk 42071 was at Hastings on an Ashford passenger turn on 9th January, when it seemed probable that some of the 42070's were to be stationed at Ashford, though the first five were originally intended for Stewarts Lane. All four through steam workings from Brighton to other regions were discontinued after 13th January, causing grave inconvenience and annoyance to intending passengers. On the last day of service the 9.40 a.m. to Bournemouth was worked by 34038 Lynton: the 11 a.m. to Cardiff had 34041 Wilton; the 11.30 a.m. to Plymouth had 34035 Shaftesbury; while the 10.47 a.m. to Birkenhead was worked from Brighton to Redhill by 31905 (U.1). |
SLS/195102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C138, name: LYNTON Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
05/09/1946 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3256 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
31/12/1948 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3303 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34038 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3253 |
|
|
14/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
18/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3252 |
|
|
12/06/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34038 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|