Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 18 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4645 Week
» 6383 Month
» 133826 Year
» 1799202 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway 21C146 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 34046 5w/e 12/02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1946 BRAUNTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed11/1946
Rebuilt (4-6-2)02/1959
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 10/10/1965
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Disposal

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LP Series 1 3296 14/11/1946 SR 4,500g 5t 0cwt
LP Series 1 3251 01/1948 SR 4,500g 5t 0cwt
LP Series 1 3299 09/12/1948 SR 4,500g 5t 0cwt
LP Series 1 3309 21/05/1953 SR 4,500g 5t 0cwt
LP Series 1 3261 15/05/1956 SR 4,500g 5t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1946
EXJ   Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B   Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951
75A   Brighton 7w/e 27/06/1951
71B   Bournemouth w/e 11/03/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 10/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE 75A Brighton 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 75A Brighton 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 11/03/1959
WDN   w/e 10/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1959 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Eastleigh Works 'Merchant Navy' Class No. 35024 East Asiatic Company was ex Works painted blue, with red lining and carrying the British Railways crest on the tender. Locomotives ex Works during February, painted malachite green included: Nos. 30739, 30797, 30805, 30924, 34031/41/46/50/52 an 35013/29. Locomotives painted black and fully lined included:-Nos. 30673, 32028/79 an 32151, while those painted plain black included Nos. 32022/27. Several 'Schools' were awaiting boilers, which are being constructed at Crewe. SLS/194904
17/03/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor MPD In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. SLS/196304
11/04/1963 Derby Works Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. SLS/196304
27/04/1963 Birmingham Excursions On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. SLS/196304
12/05/1963 Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. SLS/196304
06/02/1966 Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry 5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. SLS/196603
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1946 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C146, name: BRAUNTON
Built at Brighton Works
   
14/11/1946 Tender Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3296    
01/1948 Tender Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3251    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
09/12/1948 Tender Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3299    
12/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 34046    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
21/05/1953 Tender Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3309    
15/05/1956 Tender Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3261    
02/1959 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
10/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 34046    

prev prev