10/09/1947 |
Waterloo Station |
At an official ceremony held at Waterloo on 10/9 the following were named: 21C151 Winston Churchill, 21C152 Lord Dowding and 21C164 Fighter Command, while on 16/9 during a similar function these were also named: 21C154 Lord Beaverbrook, 21C165 Hurricane and 21C166 Spitfire. |
SLS/194710 |
30/09/1947 |
Brighton Works |
Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. |
SLS/194710 |
01/02/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops:-Nos. 21C101, CC2, 34004/05/20, 34061 73 Squadron, 34062/65, 2039/76/89, 2325, 2489, 2514, 32339, 32520 an 77062/94, for repair. Two 'Leader' Class under construction. No. 34090 left shops on 31/1 named Sir Eustace Missenden, Southern Railway Battle of Britain Class, the S.R. Coat-of-arms is also incorporated in the nameplate, the background of which is painted Air Force blue. The locomotive is painted malachite green with yellow lining, but the wheel centres instead of being black are also green and the tyres yellow. The British Railways crest is on the tender. |
SLS/194903 |
30/04/1949 |
Brighton Works |
A reconditioned boiler (BE.926) has arrived at Brighton for 'H.1' class locomotive No. 32037 Selsey Bill, now undergoing heavy repair. No. 34065 Hurricane ('B.O.B.' Class) which was about to leave the works in the experimental light green livery, has been repainted in the old S.R. livery with yellow bands. Re-numbered at Brighton: Nos. 32023/30 (6/4); No. 34008 Padstow (8/4); Nos. 32113 an 90527 (ex 77056) (11/4); 32525 an 34009 Lyme Regis (13/4). No. 32151, ex Eastleigh Works, was noted lined out at Brighton shed on 10/4 and on 20/4 No. 31826 was observed here in the same style. |
SLS/194905 |
30/06/1951 |
Britannias & B. of B.\'s |
Apart from 70004/9/14 the E.R. Allocation of Class '7' Pacifics was completed during Date: w/e 30th June, 70005 having returned from Rugby and been observed working 'The Norfolkrnan' on 27th June. On the whole these engines have made the most of their opportunities of really showing their paces on the new services which commenced with the Summer Timetable on 2nd July. The new timings, the results of imaginative and enterprising timetable work provide, among many improvements, four trains running daily between Liverpool St. and Norwich in 130 minutes. The Southern Region light 'Pacifics' have appeared on most of the main line expresses since their arrival but their activities have been somewhat circumscribed by the absence of water scoops which, on the Norwich run entails an extended stop for water at Ipswich. Despite this, 34065 worked the 8.30 a.m. 'flyer' on 20th July. 34039 also made a rare appearance on the Up 'Hook Continental' on 30th July. |
SLS/195109 |
31/05/1964 |
Eastleigh Shed (Waiting Works or Scrap) |
Ex Works: D2283, 34079, 75005, 82019. Waiting Works or Scrap: 30029, 30036, 30048, 30052/3, 30102/7/8, 30480, 30512, 30546/8, 30667, 30837, 31626/9, 31797, 31864/8, 32646, 32650, 32662, 34047, 34065/7, 34073, 76028. Interesting Locos: 70017 (5A) Failed, 75016 (5E), 4951 (81F). |
SLS/196407 |