Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 878 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14284 Week
» 67300 Month
» 186827 Year
» 3213680 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
34086 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1966 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 2 |
3340 |
02/12/1948 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3298 |
27/08/1958 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/12/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 34056/64, both new green and lined (done at Eastleigh, in the summer), 20001 (ex CC1 to-day), 34088-90 (under construction), 36001 ('Leader'), 2325/39 an 32512 (ready). No. 34086, which ran trials at the end of November, is painted in the new light green and fully lined but not the panels, while the bottom of the engine and tender casing are all green and not black; the first one to be done here in this livery. |
SLS/194901 |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 34086 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
02/12/1948 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3340 |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
27/08/1958 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3298 |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
06/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34086 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|