Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2307 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20110 Week
» 73126 Month
» 192653 Year
» 3219506 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
34106 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 2 |
3368 |
03/1950 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3272 |
31/01/1958 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1950 |
72A |
|
Exmouth Junction |
4w/e |
24/02/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/09/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
71B |
Bournemouth |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
6w/e |
24/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/03/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. |
SLS/195004 |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
10/03/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. |
SLS/196004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 34106 Built at Brighton Works Tender fitted: LP Series 2 |
|
|
31/01/1958 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3272 |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34106 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|