Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 917 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14323 Week
» 67339 Month
» 186866 Year
» 3213719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4971 |
m/e |
08/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1938) |
7971 |
y/e |
1938 |
British Railways |
47971 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Garratt |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
6652 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1930 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/11/1956 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1930 |
18C |
|
Hasland |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
18A |
|
Toton |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18C |
|
Hasland |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/11/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
17/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/11/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4971 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6652 |
|
|
1938 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7971 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hasland (18C) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47971 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
10/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47971 |
|
|