|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. | SLS/195102 |
18/08/1957 | Cromford and High Peak line (Buxton) | The following were noted on 18th August at Cromford, 68006; Sheep Pasture, 47000; Middleton Top, 58850, 68013; at Buxton under repair 58856. Also at Buxton same day, were 41066, 41905/6/8 an 58083. | SLS/195709 |
30/11/1959 | Rugby MPD | For the first time since the middle of the War (when a Princess Royal was allocated) three named engines have been transferred here viz. Patriots 45533/7/41, all unrebuilt; they are being used on freight turns. Stanier 0-4-4Ts 41902/9 stored here since Warwick closed 11/58, were withdrawn w.e. 30th November. (Note that only 41900/4 now remain in stock as 41901/2/3/5/6/7/8/9 were withdrawn also on 30th November). Late items-41904 has now been withdrawn. It is understood that the Patriots have been allocated to assist, when necessary, the new diesels. The engines withdrawn on 28th Nov. were all still on shed on 13th Dec. viz. 40565/653/77/83, 41902/9, 49266/442 . | SLS/196001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1932 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6405 Built at Derby Works |
||
1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1905 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 41905 | ||
09/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
27/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) | ||
28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 41905 | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |