Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4384 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19996 Week
» 118641 Month
» 321305 Year
» 3348158 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6406 |
m/e |
12/1932 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1946) |
1906 |
y/e |
1946 |
British Railways |
41906 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
2P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 12/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/11/1959 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
LOAN |
5A |
Crewe North |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
EXLOAN |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/08/1957 |
Cromford and High Peak line (Buxton) |
The following were noted on 18th August at Cromford, 68006; Sheep Pasture, 47000; Middleton Top, 58850, 68013; at Buxton under repair 58856. Also at Buxton same day, were 41066, 41905/6/8 an 58083. |
SLS/195709 |
30/11/1959 |
Rugby MPD |
For the first time since the middle of the War (when a Princess Royal was allocated) three named engines have been transferred here viz. Patriots 45533/7/41, all unrebuilt; they are being used on freight turns. Stanier 0-4-4Ts 41902/9 stored here since Warwick closed 11/58, were withdrawn w.e. 30th November. (Note that only 41900/4 now remain in stock as 41901/2/3/5/6/7/8/9 were withdrawn also on 30th November). Late items-41904 has now been withdrawn. It is understood that the Patriots have been allocated to assist, when necessary, the new diesels. The engines withdrawn on 28th Nov. were all still on shed on 13th Dec. viz. 40565/653/77/83, 41902/9, 49266/442 . |
SLS/196001 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6406 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1906 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41906 |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41906 |
|
|
06/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|