Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2484 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15890 Week
» 68906 Month
» 188433 Year
» 3215286 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
787 |
|
03/1882 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11503 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51503 |
|
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
2024 |
To Service |
During 03/1882 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 11/04/1957 |
Service Life |
75 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1882 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
24D |
|
Lower Darwen |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
25C |
|
Goole |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/04/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
06/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
LOAN |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/04/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1913 |
Reboilered |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1882 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 787 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 2024 |
|
|
08/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11503 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51503 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
11/04/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51503 |
|
|