Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2121 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25752 Week
» 90706 Month
» 293370 Year
» 3320223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
788 |
|
04/1882 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11484 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51484 |
|
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
2025 |
To Service |
During 04/1882 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 13/06/1959 |
Service Life |
77 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1917 |
Reboilered |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1882 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 788 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 2025 |
|
|
02/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11484 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (20F) |
|
|
04/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (13B) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51484 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51484 |
|
|