Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19936 Week
» 72952 Month
» 192479 Year
» 3219332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
297 |
m/e |
11/1883 |
Caledonian Railway (1918) |
264 |
y/e |
1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17234 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57234 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
294 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3046 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 11/1883 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1957 |
Service Life |
73 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1883 |
30D |
|
Ayr |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
03/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30D |
Ayr |
w/e |
09/11/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/02/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/06/1949 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 625, 2268, 2739, 14452, 54456, 17234, 17365/79, 57566, 17637. |
SLS/194907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 297 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 3046 |
|
|
1918 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 264 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17234 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ayr (30D) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57234 |
|
|
03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57234 |
|
|