Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 738 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14144 Week
» 67160 Month
» 186687 Year
» 3213540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
522 |
m/e |
08/1884 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17256 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57256 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
294 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3257 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 08/1884 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/10/1961 |
Service Life |
77 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1884 |
28A |
|
Motherwell |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1917 |
Unspecified rebuilding undertaken |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1884 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 522 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 3257 |
|
|
1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Unspecified rebuilding undertaken |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17256 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57256 |
|
|
02/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57256 |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|