Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 394 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18197 Week
» 71213 Month
» 190740 Year
» 3217593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
853 |
m/e |
08/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17591 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57591 |
|
01/01/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. McIntosh |
Class |
812 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4638 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/06/1961 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
4w/e |
15/05/1954 |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
10/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
60B |
Aviemore |
4w/e |
17/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
64C |
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
03/06/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1911 |
Steam heating apparatus |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/10/1949 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 44799, 45066, 5476, 17591. |
SLS/194911 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 853 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4638 |
|
|
1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heating apparatus |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17591 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Forres (32C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57591 |
|
|
12/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
07/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
17/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aviemore (60B) |
|
|
03/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
20/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57591 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|