|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/04/1964 | Derby Shed (On Shed) | On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1925 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4042 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E) | ||
02/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Goole (25C) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aintree (23B) | ||
15/10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44042 | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Goole (25C) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) | ||
28/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G) | ||
21/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) | ||
09/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (16C) | ||
17/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44042 | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |