|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/04/1962 | Horwich Works (Light Repair Shop) | Paint Shop: 42789, 48670, LYR 1008, D4127, uM65437, uM77158, uM28580, u28930, u29154, u29241, u29653, u29830 M. Light Repair Shop: 44061, D2388. Test House: 47550, 11305. Yard: 43017, 44334, 47402/29, 48684, 11324/68, uM28331, u29560, u29881 M. Erecting Shop: 42708/32, 42828, 42979, 43960, 44074, 44266, 44364/79, 44468, 44554, 48123/38/61, 48295, 48403, 48715 Wren, 12001/9/19/36/49/63/71, D4128-30 (Engines and body sides), D4131/2 (Engines on frames), D4133/4 (frames only). Outside Erecting Shop: 42896, 42959, 44003, 48257, 48321, D117. Car Shop: uM28221, u28497, u28690, u29022, u29289, u29720/2 M. Scrap Road: NIL. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1925 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4061 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) | ||
24/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
11/12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44061 | ||
30/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (4B) | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (4B) | ||
23/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alsager (5E) | ||
05/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
12/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Skipton (24G) | ||
06/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
27/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Skipton (24G) | ||
19/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Workington (12D) | ||
12/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44061 | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |