Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2721 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16127 Week
» 69143 Month
» 188670 Year
» 3215523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4062 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
British Railways |
44062 |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23C |
Southport |
w/e |
22/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
4w/e |
30/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
3w/e |
30/12/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4062 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
19/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44062 |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44062 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|