Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 909 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14315 Week
» 67331 Month
» 186858 Year
» 3213711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4069 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
British Railways |
44069 |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4069 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44069 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44069 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|