Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17918 Week
» 70934 Month
» 190461 Year
» 3217314 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4078 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
British Railways |
44078 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4078 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44078 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
09/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44078 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|