Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4236 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
British Railways |
44236 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 03/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/10/1964 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
9G |
Gorton |
5w/e |
02/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4236 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LMS) (19G) |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44236 |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44236 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|