Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3439 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13013 Week
» 77967 Month
» 280631 Year
» 3307484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4253 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
British Railways |
44253 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 07/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 01/10/1962 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1926 |
31A |
|
St Rollox (Balornock) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63A |
|
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63A |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/02/1953 |
4F renumbering |
No. 44436 was the last of the Class 4F to be renumbered, the first two were 44253 an 44325 in March 1948, so that it has taken almost five years to complete the series 43835-44606. It is believed that one of the 2-8-0 (M8602) still has to be dealt with to complete that class. |
SLS/195304 |
09/11/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops : 42262/9, 61397, 65910, 80093, D260, D6142/4/7. Ex Works 45461, 64595. Scrapped in last 4 weeks-44008/253, 47168, 47536, 57331/613, 65313, 69204. Awaiting scrap: 44254, 57378, 64478, 90513. |
SLS/196212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4253 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44253 |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44253 |
|
|