Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 251 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14294 Week
» 79248 Month
» 281912 Year
» 3308765 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4258 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
British Railways |
44258 |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 08/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 21/05/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1926 |
29A |
|
Perth South |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
60A |
|
Inverness |
4w/e |
23/09/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
60A |
Inverness |
2w/e |
09/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4258 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44258 |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44258 |
|
|
06/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|