Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4300 |
m/e |
02/1927 |
British Railways |
44300 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 02/1927 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/12/1965 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4300 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44300 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D) |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44300 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|