Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4294 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13868 Week
» 78822 Month
» 281486 Year
» 3308339 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4382 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
British Railways |
44382 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1926 |
9D |
|
Buxton (LNWR) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
9B |
|
Stockport Edgeley |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
4w/e |
07/08/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4382 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44382 |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44382 |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|