Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1374 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19177 Week
» 72193 Month
» 191720 Year
» 3218573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4388 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
British Railways |
44388 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
EXLOAN |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
2F |
Market Harborough |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
5w/e |
30/04/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/07/1958 |
Market Harborough MPD |
Now that this LNWR depot is in the Midland Division, all wash-outs are performed at Leicester (15C) instead of Rugby. On 20th July locomotives on shed were-42446(15F), 42673(2A), 44388(15F), 44847(14D), 48290(2E), 48445(2E), 48601(1A) and 49444(15F). 49447 was at Leicester, |
SLS/195808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4388 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44388 |
|
|
01/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Market Harborough (2F) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44388 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|