Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4140 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17546 Week
» 70562 Month
» 190089 Year
» 3216942 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4396 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
British Railways |
44396 |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
8E |
Brunswick |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
4w/e |
30/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4396 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C) |
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44396 |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44396 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|