Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1055 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14461 Week
» 67477 Month
» 187004 Year
» 3213857 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4404 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
British Railways |
44404 |
w/e |
23/06/1951 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/06/1951 |
\"4F\" Class 0-6-0 |
Of the 772 engines comprising this class, only 15 still carry their L.M.S. numbers-3840 (17A), 3904 (23C), 3942 (20C), 4003 (20C), 4032 (23C), 4098 (20D), 4245 (20B), 4248 (21A), 4335 (20B), 4401 (16A), 4404 (20A), 4435/6 (17B), 4457 (19C), 4568 (19A). |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4404 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44404 |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
02/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44404 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|