|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1958 | Derby Works (Erecting shop: 2 bay) | Paint shop-42337, 42518, 43960, 73044, 12043, D5005. D/E Erecting shop-10203, 10800, 12035, 13026/37/9, 15004, ED2, ED7, and last two of order D658 D3571/2. Test House-D3570, D5006. Erecting shop: 1 bay-42410G, 42421I, 44247G, 44276I, 44408G, 4463G, 47165I, 47464I, 48371I, 48403G, 48408G, 48637G, 48760I, 75026G, 80081I, 1 bay stripping-42378, 42381; Erecting shop: 2 bay-42516I, 44501G, 48063I, 48322I, 2 bay stripping-44009, 44400; Erecting shop: 3 bay-D5008-14 New, Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D1, 3, 4 & 5, 1Co-Co1 2300 H.P.; Works Yard-40047, 40680, 41083, 41090, 42534, 43186, 43856, 44053, 47309, 48533, 48611, 48639, 12096, D2(fr.), D3569, D5084/7. Locomotives stored-40538, 43881, 43930, 44142, 44369, 58132 an 49418. | SLS/195901 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1927 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4501 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
29/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44501 | ||
10/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
24/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
06/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (17E) | ||
15/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rowsley (16J) | ||
09/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Coalville (15E) | ||
12/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44501 | ||
07/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |