Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4177 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17583 Week
» 70599 Month
» 190126 Year
» 3216979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4586 |
m/e |
09/1939 |
British Railways |
44586 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 09/1939 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
25 yrs , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1939 |
20D |
|
Normanton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20B |
|
Stourton |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/09/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20B |
Stourton |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4586 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44586 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44586 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|