29/01/1948 |
Derby Works |
Class '4F' 2-6-0 No. 3000: No. 3000 has been on trial at Derby since the second week in December, but is now at Rowsley. This engine has outside cylinders and Walschaerts valve-gear, with a very high running-plate, double blast-pipe and chimney, top-feed apparatus half-way between chimney and dome (as on the later Class '5' 4-6-0's), manifold on top of the firebox in front of the cab, V-shaped cab front, and tender-cab (similar to the Class '2F' 2-6-0's, but larger). The regulator is of the double pull-out type, and the brakes can also be worked from either side of the cab; there are two live-steam injectors on the fireman's side of the cab. No. 3000 is not fitted with electric lighting or roller-bearings. Oil-burning Class '4F' 0-6-0's.: Nos. 4552 an 4585 have been running trials from Derby for the last two months, generally on the Wirksworth branch freight trains, but Nos. 4598 an 4466 are standing in the dead-engine road between the station and the Works. It is reported that these 0-6-0's have not been as successful as the oil-burning Class '5' 4-6-0's and Class '8' 2-8-0's, owing to their smaller fireboxes. They go to Nottingham to refuel |
SLS/194803 |
31/12/1949 |
Derby Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12. Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December. |
SLS/195002 |
15/09/1950 |
Derby Works |
For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
14/10/1950 |
Derby Works |
For Works: W/E 14/10/50:-40585 27A, 40910 9E, 41057 17A, 41060 17A, 41080 20E, 1846 16A, 42301 11D, 42414 25B, 3058 (58204) 19C, 3274 9D, 43615 8B, 43885 18B, 43911 21A, 44408 16A, 44599 17B, 45594 19B. New Construction: 12077 in Paint Shop and 12078-80 complete on 9/10; 42052 on trials 29/9 and 42053 9/10; 42054/5 complete, 42056 almost complete and frames for next two down, 9/10; frames for the next diesel (d12081) are also laid down. Ex Works: 41062, 41154, 43914, 44598, 64980, 58209, 64962, 40351, 41068, 41006, 47548, 42353, 43456, 47481. No. 10800 was on test run on 29/9, and 10800 was standing outside the diesel shop on 9/10. |
SLS/195012 |
12/07/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. |
SLS/196108 |