Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
11272 |
m/e |
12/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1933) |
7102 |
y/e |
1933 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1939) |
7162 |
y/e |
1939 |
British Railways |
47162 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
2F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
61 |
To Service |
During 12/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 09/12/1959 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1928 |
28B |
|
Dalry Road |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64A |
|
St Margarets |
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 11272 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
1933 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7102 |
|
|
1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7162 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dalry Road (28B) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47162 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
09/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47162 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|