Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 520 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18323 Week
» 71339 Month
» 190866 Year
» 3217719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Tilbury & Southend Railway |
77 |
m/e |
1908 |
Midland Railway |
2188 |
y/e |
1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
2228 |
y/e |
1924 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1939) |
2188 |
y/e |
1939 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1947) |
1988 |
w/e |
27/09/1947 |
British Railways |
41988 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
1908 |
Fobbing |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
1908 |
13A |
|
Plaistow |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/05/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1908 |
To Service |
To service as London, Tilbury & Southend Railway Number 77, name: Fobbing Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18506 |
|
|
1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2188 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2228 |
|
|
1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2188 |
|
|
27/09/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1988 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41988 |
|
|
05/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41988 |
|
|