Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1816 |
m/e |
11/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9045 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
49045 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3821 |
To Service |
During 11/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/12/1962 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1897 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
3D |
|
Aston |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
2B |
|
Nuneaton |
w/e |
24/02/1962 |
21B |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
5w/e |
03/03/1962 |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bescot |
5w/e |
05/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1897 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1816 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3821 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9045 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49045 |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49045 |
|
|