Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 552 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19463 Week
» 84417 Month
» 287081 Year
» 3313934 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1834 |
m/e |
07/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9028 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49028 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3839 |
To Service |
During 07/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1956 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
85C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
29/02/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/03/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1898 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1834 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3839 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9028 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49028 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
03/03/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49028 |
|
|