Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 365 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18168 Week
» 71184 Month
» 190711 Year
» 3217564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1842 |
m/e |
10/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8966 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
British Railways |
48966 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3847 |
To Service |
During 10/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/02/1950 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1898 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1842 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3847 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8966 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48966 |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
18/02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48966 |
|
|